Yammine, Nadine Vanessa (CPSO#: 91941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
336A King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1G1
Phone: (519) 397-1721
Fax: (519) 397-3687
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.V. Yammine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yammine ( CPSO# 91941 )

Business Address:
336A King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1G1
Phone Number: (519) 397-1721

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE VANESSA YAMMINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAMMINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2011