Yan, Hanmu (CPSO#: 95783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
Department of Urology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1290 Keith Ross Dr, Oshawa
Oshawa ON  L1J 8P5
Canada
Phone: (905) 721-4960
Fax: 905) 721-4352
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hanmu Yan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yan ( CPSO# 95783 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
Department of Urology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANMU YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016