Yan, Justin Way-Ben (CPSO#: 90565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76534
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin W. Yan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yan ( CPSO# 90565 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN WAY-BEN YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014