Yan, Ran (CPSO#: 97555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ran Yan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yan ( CPSO# 97555 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 04 Nov 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAN YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Feb 2015 to 07 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2015 to 17 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2015