Yanagawa, Robert Kei (CPSO#: 88877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
Room 003D, Floor 8
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5706
Fax: (416) 864-5031
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT KEI YANAGAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANAGAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2015