Yang, Christine Ping (CPSO#: 82843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Shanxi Medical College, Taiyun, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
Physical Medicine & Rehab Service
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6094
Fax: (603) 562-6312
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Yang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yang ( CPSO# 82843 )

Business Address:
Elizabeth Bruyere Health Centre
Physical Medicine & Rehab Service
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6094

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE PING YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Jun 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006