Yang, Ilun (CPSO#: 84728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Section B3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43850
Fax: (905) 528-9388
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yang Douglass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yang ( CPSO# 84728 )
Dr. R. Douglass ( CPSO# 84651 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Suite B3
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 525-3501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILUN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011