Yang, Simon Yie (CPSO#: 84729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
Suite 407
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Fax: (905) 472-9240
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Yang & Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yang ( CPSO# 84729 )
Dr. S. Yuen ( CPSO# 84760 )

Business Address:
403 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-0660

Business Address:
Health for All Family Health Team
379 Church Street, Suite #202
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 472-2200

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
Suite 401
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7122

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON YIE YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2012