Yang, Yee Kwan (CPSO#: 89830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bur Oaks Pediatrics
C-10 - 50 Bur Oaks Ave
Markham ON  L6C 0A2
Phone: (416) 235-1757
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. K. Yang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Yang ( CPSO# 89830 )

Business Address:
10C - 50 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 235-1757

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YEE KWAN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Sep 2008 to 16 Sep 2008
PEAP - Resident - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 17 Sep 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015