Yap, Stanley Alexander (CPSO#: 93492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  20 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Loyola University of Chicago, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-289-3200
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarbourough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 18 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 20 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.   Stanley  Alexander  Yap  may  practise  urology  at  the  following
                  locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College:

                  (i)   Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital in Scarborough, Ontario;
                  
                  (ii)  Scarborough Hospital - General Campus in Scarborough, Ontario;
                  
                  (iii) Scarborough  Hospital  - Birchmount Campus in Scarborough, Ontario;
                        and,
                  
                  (iv)  North York General Hospital in North York, Ontario.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  eighteen  months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Yap's knowledge, skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required reports to the College  by  the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Yap's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report,  pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Yap's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 21, 2017,  and  will  expire on or
                  before May 20, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.