Yar, Fatemeh Roya (CPSO#: 73794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jun 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Persian, Urdu

Education:Jabalpur University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
393 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 1V2
Phone: (905) 297-2983
Fax: (905) 297-2984
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roya Yar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2006

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Aug 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2007 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  April  13,  2007, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed by the Discipline  Committee  of the College of Physicians and Surgeons
            of Ontario on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Fatemah Roya Yar:

                  1.    Dr. Yar shall not administer  or  order  the  administration  of  a
                        thrombolytic to a patient, unless she obtains the prior approval of
                        a  physician  who  has been approved by the College.  This approval
                        requirement will remain  in  place  for  a  minimum  of twelve (12)
                        months,  or  if  after twelve months Dr. Yar has not handled  three
                        cases where thrombolytics were properly administered, until she has
                        handled three such cases.

                  2.    Dr. Yar is required  to  undergo  a chart review of cases involving
                        thrombolytics  that she handles during  the  time  the  restriction
                        above is in effect,  with  the  supervisor  who  is responsible for
                        approving  her  use  of thrombolytics every three months.   In  the
                        chart review, the supervisor  will  review  the charts, discuss the
                        cases  with  Dr.  Yar, and discuss her knowledge  with  respect  to
                        thrombolytics.  The supervisor is required to submit reports to the
                        College quarterly.
                  
                  3.    Dr. Yar is required  to  engage  in  a  course of self-study of the
                        American   College   of   Cardiology/American   Heart   Association
                        Guidelines for Management of Patients with ST-Elevation  Myocardial
                        Infarction  (2004), and the American College of Cardiology/American
                        Heart Association  2002  Guideline  Update  for  the  Management of
                        Patients   with   Unstable   Angina  and  Non-ST-Segment  Elevation
                        Myocardial Infarction, prepare  a  report  on those guidelines with
                        respect  to  the use of thrombolytics, and engage  in  a  follow-up
                        discussion of  the  guidelines  with  the supervisor referred to in
                        paragraph 2.  The supervisor shall report  to  the College that the
                        course  of  self-study  has  been  satisfactorily  completed.  This
                        educational  program  shall be completed within six months  of  the
                        date the penalty is imposed.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Mar 2006
Summary:

On April 11, 2007, Dr. Yar filed a Notice of Appeal of the decision of the Discipline Committee 
to the Divisional Court.  In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline Committee remains 
in effect despite the appeal.   On January 13, 2009 the Divisional Court dismissed the appeal. 
 
On March 17, 2006, the Discpline Committee found Dr. Fatemah Yar to have committed acts of 
professional misconduct by failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in her 
contemplated use of thrombolytics in two cardiac patients.  
 
On March 13, 2007, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario ordered the following: 
 
1.     The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose a term, condition and limitation 
on the certificate of registration of Dr. Fatemah Roya Yar that she shall not administer or order 
the administration of a thrombolytic to a patient, unless she obtains the prior approval of a 
physician who has been approved by the College.  This approval requirement will remain in 
place for a minimum of twelve (12) months, or if after twelve months Dr. Yar has not handled 
three cases where thrombolytics were properly administered, until she has handled three such 
cases. 
 
2.    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose a term, condition and limitation 
on the certificate of registration of Dr. Fatemah Roya Yar that Dr. Yar be required to undergo a 
chart review of cases involving thrombolytics that she handles during the time paragraph 2 is in 
effect, with the supervisor who is responsible for approving her use of thrombolytics every three 
months.  In the chart review, the supervisor will review the charts, discuss the cases with Dr. 
Yar, and discuss her knowledge with respect to thrombolytics.  The supervisor is required to 
submit reports to the College quarterly. 
 
3.     The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose a term, condition and limitation 
on the certificate of registration of Dr. Fatemah Roya Yar that Dr. Yar is required to engage in a 
course of self-study of the American College of Cardiology/American Heart Association 
Guidelines for Management of Patients with ST-Elevation Myocardial Infarction (2004), and the 
American College of Cardiology/American Heart Association 2002 Guideline Update for the 
Management of Patients with Unstable Angina and Non-ST-Segment Elevation Myocardial 
Infarction, prepare a report on those guidelines with respect to the use of thrombolytics, and 
engage in a follow-up discussion of the guidelines with the supervisor referred to in paragraph 2. 
 The supervisor shall report to the College that the course of self-study has been satisfactorily 
completed. This educational program shall be completed within six months of the date the 
penalty is imposed. 
 
4.    The Discipline Committee Orders Dr. Yar to pay to the College costs in the amount of 
$9,765.00 within 6 months of the date of the Order.   
 
 5.      The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
register. 
 
              
               
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 13 Jan 2009
Hearing Date(s): Sep 19, 2005