Yarom, Nirit (CPSO#: 89714)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011