Yaron, Michal (CPSO#: 77154)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 14 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004