Yasufuku, Kazuhiro (CPSO#: 84143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:Chiba Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room EN 9N 957
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4290
Fax: (416) 340-3660
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kazuhiro Yasufuku Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yasufuku ( CPSO# 84143 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
9N-957 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4290

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Horpital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 28 Aug 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 07 Jun 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Jun 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Kazuhiro Yasufuku may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr. Yasufuku holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when Dr. Yasufuku
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.