Yatsynovich, Viktor (CPSO#: 92412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Nov 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Belarusian State Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Hospital System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 3263
Fax: (905) 683-8527
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Portage Medical Family Health Team
303-4256 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A4
Canada
Phone: 905-354-9393
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

A5-4725 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 0A8
Canada
Phone: 289-296-7600
Fax: 289-296-7666
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yatsynovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Yatsynovich ( CPSO# 92412 )

Business Address:
4725 Dorchester Road
Suite A6
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 0A8
Phone Number: (289) 296-7600

Business Address:
RNHS Psychiatry Department
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Viktor Yatsynovich may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.