Yau, Cameron Kin Mo (CPSO#: 91193)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2016