Yau, Daphne Kit Han (CPSO#: 93214)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 209 Banbury Rd Toronto, ON M3B 3C6
Date Received: 10 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 10 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2016 to 02 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018