Yau, Eric Kin Cheong (CPSO#: 80541)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 18 May 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 19 May 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2004