Yau, Gary Lloyd Ka Tao (CPSO#: 95294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
2065 Finch Ave W
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Yau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yau ( CPSO# 95294 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY LLOYD KA TAO YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2017