Yau, Jennifer Kwok Wai (CPSO#: 74425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: (613) 760-3723
Fax: (613) 232-4818
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KWOK WAI YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 1999 to 24 Dec 1999
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Oct 2000 to 03 Nov 2000
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003