Yazdanian, Shirin Olga (CPSO#: 84759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Delhi Family Health Team
Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone: (519) 582-2323
Fax: (519) 582-1513
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Bruen & Shirin Yazdanian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yazdanian ( CPSO# 84759 )
Dr. R. Bruen ( CPSO# 102010)

Business Address:
West Street Medical Clinic
Suite 302
216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 426-9851

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
Delhi Family Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone Number: (519) 582-2323

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRIN OLGA YAZDANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008