Ye, Juan (CPSO#: 83039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Shanghai Second Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2035
32 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S6
Phone: (905) 604-5535
Fax: (905) 604-7669
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juan Ye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ye ( CPSO# 83039 )

Business Address:
2035 - 32 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S6
Phone Number: (905) 604-5535

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUAN YE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007