Yeates, Karen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etherington Hall
Queen's University
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 533-6730
Fax: (613) 533-3214
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen E. Yeates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yeates ( CPSO# 71530 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH YEATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEATES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2001