Yeboah, Elizabeth (CPSO#: 95627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103E
4581 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 1M6
Phone: (905) 479-9693
Fax: (905) 415-1371
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
Units 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Dr W
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 497-7779
Fax: (905) 497-7707
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 301
3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2M4J5
Canada
Phone: 416-733-7772
Fax: 416-224-9880
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 1P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-7309
Fax: (888)979-6305
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Yeboah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yeboah ( CPSO# 95627 )

Business Address:
Enhanced Care
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 1P9
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Business Address:
MCI The Doctor's Office
Unit 700
200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Phone Number: (905) 856-2100

Business Address:
301 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 733-7772

Business Address:
103E - 4581 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 1M6
Phone Number: (905) 479-9693

Business Address:
Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
Units 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone Number: (905) 497-7779

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH YEBOAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEBOAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016