Yeboah, Ophelia (CPSO#: 86698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst Street, Suite 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: 905-597-7079
Fax: 905-597-7197
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

360 Highway 7 East, Unit#6
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Canada
Phone: 905-881-0360
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212 Ext. 4401
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OPHELIA YEBOAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEBOAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2012