Yee, Angelina (CPSO#: 79760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angelina Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yee ( CPSO# 79760 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 24, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Angelina Yee, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Yee to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Yee has voluntarily agreed not to engage in surgical assist.