Yee, Gayle Margaret (CPSO#: 70560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone: (705) 253-1313
Fax: (705) 253-8759
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Canada
Phone: (705) 253-1313
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. R. Tull ( CPSO# 93890 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Gayle Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 253-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAYLE MARGARET YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998