Yee, May-Sann (CPSO#: 89829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Anesthesia / Critical Care Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 1613
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.S. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yee ( CPSO# 89829 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Anesthesiology & Critical Care
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3P 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAY-SANN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008