Yegappan, Chidambaram (CPSO#: 89864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences Centre
300 Prince Philip Drive
St. John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-6300
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 14 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIDAMBARAM YEGAPPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEGAPPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2009 to 27 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016