Yeh, Calvin Hsiung (CPSO#: 110253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Calvin  Hsiung  Yeh  shall  practise  medicine  as  required  by the
                  postgraduate  medical  education program in which Dr. Yeh is enrolled  at
                  the University of Toronto.

            (2)   In Dr. Yeh's practice in  the postgraduate medical education program, Dr.
                  Yeh shall prescribe drugs only  for  in-patients  or  out-patients  of  a
                  clinical  teaching  unit  that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where Dr. Yeh is properly practising  medicine  and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned by the department  as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Yeh's practice in the postgraduate medical education  program, Dr.
                  Yeh shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr.  Yeh  may practise adult critical care medicine and to the extent  of
                  his employment  at  Lakeridge  Health  Corporation  Oshawa,  while  under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In  Dr. Yeh's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. Yeh may not charge
                  a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of  registration  expires,  and Dr. Yeh must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Yeh is no longer enrolled in a program  of  postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr. Yeh  no  longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship,  permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid  employment authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Yeh must immediately  cease  all  practice
                  outside  the  postgraduate  medical  education  program if any one of the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4)  notifies the College of
                        any  concerns  regarding  Dr.  Yeh's  practice, including  but  not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Yeh's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval   for   Dr.    Yeh  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Yeh's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if  Dr. Yeh takes a leave  of  absence,  or  transfers  to  another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education  program  specified in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the   event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Yeh  may  not  resume  any  practice  outside   the
                  postgraduate  medical education program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy  until  Dr.  Yeh  applies  for  a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2018.  In accordance with paragraph
                  6(a),  this certificate of registration expires on June  30,  2019.   All
                  practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.