Yeh, Eluen Ann (CPSO#: 73509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: Yeh, Ellen Ann (used until: 06 Jul 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Japanese

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6332
Fax: (416) 813-7096
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yeh ( CPSO# 73509 )
Dr. R. Scott ( CPSO# 57441 )

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
100 - 155 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone Number: (905) 945-5476

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Aug 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELUEN ANN YEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003