Yen, Edwina (CPSO#: 31552)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018