Yeung, Albert (CPSO#: 71842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
420 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3K2
Phone: (905) 695-0901
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 1030
28 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 4P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 604-5282
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2nd Floor
300 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2
Canada
Phone: (416) 847-8940
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2nd Floor
418 Eglinton Ave West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A2
Canada
Phone: (647) 812-1398
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

325 Bamburgh Circle
Scarborough ON  M1W 3Y1
Canada
Phone: (416) 492-8068
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yeung ( CPSO# 71842 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
420 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3K2
Phone Number: (905) 695-0901

Business Address:
325 Bamburgh Circle
Scarborough ON  M1W 3Y1
Phone Number: (416) 492-8068

Business Address:
1030 - 28 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 604-5282

Business Address:
418 Eglinton Avenue West
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5N 1A2
Phone Number: (647) 812-1398

Business Address:
2nd Floor
300 Silver Star Beoulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2
Phone Number: (416) 847-8940

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 06 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 1997 to 24 Aug 1997
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999