Yeung, Alex (CPSO#: 90715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Markham Stouffville Hospital
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alex Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yeung ( CPSO# 90715 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014