Yeung, Carrie Ka Yee (CPSO#: 96035)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Center
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carrie Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yeung ( CPSO# 96035 )

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Center
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARRIE KA YEE YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2015