Yeung, Ching (CPSO#: 93364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

Expiry Date:  28 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Yeung, Isis Ching (used until: 10 Nov 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Thoracic Surgery
501 Smyth Road
K1H 8L6
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-737-8845
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHING YEUNG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YEUNG is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. YEUNG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YEUNG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. YEUNG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. YEUNG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. YEUNG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 28 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jun 2019