Yeung, Telford Yee-Leung (CPSO#: 111014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TELFORD YEE-LEUNG YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2016 to 22 Nov 2016
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Oct 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2018