Yik, David Keen Hoe (CPSO#: 92698)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014