Ying, Ethel (CPSO#: 74882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Pediatrics Department
15th Floor Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Ying Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ying ( CPSO# 74882 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Pediatrics Department
15th Floor Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-3655

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ETHEL YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2002