Ying, Luis Tseng Jung (CPSO#: 68218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 790-6362
Fax: (905) 790-6612
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ying Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ying ( CPSO# 68218 )

Business Address:
Suite 11
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-6362

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIS TSENG JUNG YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1999