Ying, Yvonne (CPSO#: 77685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Room 3363
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2568
Fax: (613) 738-4840
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Ying Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ying ( CPSO# 77685 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Suite 3363
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008