Yip, Amelia Ming Ching (CPSO#: 90717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 - 430 Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252 Ext. 416
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amelia Yip Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yip ( CPSO# 90717 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMELIA MING CHING YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2015 to 21 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 22 Aug 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2016