Yoon, Grace (CPSO#: 73224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Clinical & Metabolic
Genetics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6389
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE YOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 1999 to 05 Feb 1999
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2006