You, Calorine (CPSO#: 88880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre - ER Dept
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6004
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary - ER Dept
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Calorine You Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. You ( CPSO# 88880 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CALORINE YOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010