Youn, Andrew Eun Sun (CPSO#: 93567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
515-3030 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-2300
Fax: 4164312303
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Respirology
76 Grenville St - 4th floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6137
Fax: (416) 323-6132
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Youn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Youn ( CPSO# 93567 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6137

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
Suite 515
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-2300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW EUN SUN YOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2014