Young, Deidre Caroline (CPSO#: 77487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deidre Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Young ( CPSO# 77487 )

Business Address:
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Feb 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEIDRE CAROLINE YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 07 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2005