Young Hoon, Kit Ngan (CPSO#: 83845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northwestern Health Unit
210 First Street North
Kenora ON  P9N 2K4
Phone: 1 807 468 3147
Electoral District: 09

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIT NGAN YOUNG HOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG HOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 14 Nov 2005 to 03 Feb 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 04 Feb 2006 to 13 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 14 Nov 2006 to 13 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 14 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Sep 2010 to 07 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Sep 2011 to 07 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013