Young, Ian Gordon (CPSO#: 79288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 Blake Street
Barrie ON  L4M 1K7
Phone: (705) 727-9896
Fax: (705) 727-9294
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

641 Cambria Rd
Borden ON  L0M1C0
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana & Ian Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Young ( CPSO# 79288 )
Dr. D. Young ( CPSO# 78423 )

Business Address:
301 Blake Street
Barrie ON  L4M 1K7
Phone Number: (705) 727-9896

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jul 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GORDON YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 24 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2005