Young, James William Stewart (CPSO#: 93353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-6586
Fax: 905-494-6623
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Young ( CPSO# 93353 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6586

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 863-2551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM STEWART YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2014