Young, Jeanne (CPSO#: 78435)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2003